|
09/20/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 322, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 6313.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
June 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2024
|
Referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 4023.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3967.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1. Page 3721.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|