|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 871, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 5506.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6525.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 4024.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3967.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3465.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|