|
03/28/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2023-24 First Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
(Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 54.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 53.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Amendments by Assembly Member Joe Patterson tabled on motion by Assembly Member Reyes. (Ayes 59. Noes 19. Page 53.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Read second time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
(Ayes 60. Noes 18. Page 51.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Assembly Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (March 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on U.& E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Joint Rule 37.4 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 44.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Article IV Section 8(b) of the Constitution Invoked.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 23.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
(Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 23.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Joint Rule 37.4 suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 23.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 24.) (March 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2. Page 20.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Set for hearing March 23 in APPR pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|