Senate | 08/31/2024 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Gonzalez. | ||
Senate | 09/05/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2275.) (September 1). | ||
Senate | 08/29/2023 | Set for hearing September 1. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2023 | August 28 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2023 | Set for hearing August 28. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1026.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |