Senate | 02/08/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | January 10 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 2970.) | ||
Senate | 12/21/2023 | Set for hearing January 10. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | April 19 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 791.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | April 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |