Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2692.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2275.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2023
|
Set for hearing September 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2023
|
August 28 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
Set for hearing August 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1026.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 994.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8 in E. & C.A. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|