03/15/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2024. | |||
03/15/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1 p.m. | |||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4299.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 4). | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2024 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3200.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | (Corrected February 15.) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |