Assembly | 04/02/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 2). | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2024 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 3227.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3212.) (February 26). | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Set for hearing February 26. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |