04/19/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2024. | |||
04/19/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4786.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Essayli. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2024 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3297.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |