08/13/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2024. | |||
08/13/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
Senate | 08/05/2024 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6202.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2024 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2024 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4490.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2024 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | Set for hearing June 10. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4229.) (May 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |