07/03/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2024. | |||
07/03/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 06/27/2024 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6039.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2024 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4510.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |