California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR158 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 158 CHAPTER 163 Relative to Chiari Malformation Awareness Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State August 13, 2024. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 158, Niello. Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.This measure would declare September 2024 as Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Chiari malformation is a serious neurological disorder affecting more than 300,000 people in the United States; andWHEREAS, Chiari malformation was first identified by Austrian pathologist Professor Hans Chiari in the 1890s and categorized into four types, in order of severity; andWHEREAS, Chiari malformation is a congenital malformation in which the bottom of the brain, known as the cerebellum, is crowded in the skull cavity and forces the lower tips of the cerebellar hemispheres, or tonsils, into the hole in the bottom of the skull, or foramen magnum; andWHEREAS, Chiari malformations are defects in the cerebellum, the part of the brain that controls balance, and this creates pressure on the cerebellum and brain stem and may block the normal flow of cerebral spinal fluid to and from the brain; andWHEREAS, Symptoms usually appear during adolescence or early adulthood and can include severe head and neck pain, vertigo, muscle weakness, balance problems, blurred or double vision, difficulty swallowing, and sleep apnea; and WHEREAS, Individuals who have Chiari malformation may often have related conditions, such as hydrocephalus, spina bifida, syringomyelia, tethered spinal cord syndrome, and spinal curvature; andWHEREAS, The National Institute of Neurological Disorders and Stroke within the National Institutes of Health, is conducting research to find alternative surgical options and to identify the cause of Chiari malformations to create improved treatment and prevention plans; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares September 2024 as Chiari Malformation Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled August 09, 2024 Passed IN Senate June 27, 2024 Passed IN Assembly August 08, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 158Introduced by Senator NielloJune 05, 2024 Relative to Chiari Malformation Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 158, Niello. Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.This measure would declare September 2024 as Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Chiari malformation is a serious neurological disorder affecting more than 300,000 people in the United States; andWHEREAS, Chiari malformation was first identified by Austrian pathologist Professor Hans Chiari in the 1890s and categorized into four types, in order of severity; andWHEREAS, Chiari malformation is a congenital malformation in which the bottom of the brain, known as the cerebellum, is crowded in the skull cavity and forces the lower tips of the cerebellar hemispheres, or tonsils, into the hole in the bottom of the skull, or foramen magnum; andWHEREAS, Chiari malformations are defects in the cerebellum, the part of the brain that controls balance, and this creates pressure on the cerebellum and brain stem and may block the normal flow of cerebral spinal fluid to and from the brain; andWHEREAS, Symptoms usually appear during adolescence or early adulthood and can include severe head and neck pain, vertigo, muscle weakness, balance problems, blurred or double vision, difficulty swallowing, and sleep apnea; and WHEREAS, Individuals who have Chiari malformation may often have related conditions, such as hydrocephalus, spina bifida, syringomyelia, tethered spinal cord syndrome, and spinal curvature; andWHEREAS, The National Institute of Neurological Disorders and Stroke within the National Institutes of Health, is conducting research to find alternative surgical options and to identify the cause of Chiari malformations to create improved treatment and prevention plans; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares September 2024 as Chiari Malformation Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 158 CHAPTER 163 Relative to Chiari Malformation Awareness Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State August 13, 2024. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 158, Niello. Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.This measure would declare September 2024 as Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
3+ Enrolled August 09, 2024 Passed IN Senate June 27, 2024 Passed IN Assembly August 08, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 158Introduced by Senator NielloJune 05, 2024 Relative to Chiari Malformation Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 158, Niello. Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.This measure would declare September 2024 as Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
44
5- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 158 CHAPTER 163
5+ Enrolled August 09, 2024 Passed IN Senate June 27, 2024 Passed IN Assembly August 08, 2024
66
7- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 158
7+Enrolled August 09, 2024
8+Passed IN Senate June 27, 2024
9+Passed IN Assembly August 08, 2024
810
9- CHAPTER 163
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION
12+
13+ Senate Concurrent Resolution
14+
15+No. 158
16+
17+Introduced by Senator NielloJune 05, 2024
18+
19+Introduced by Senator Niello
20+June 05, 2024
1021
1122 Relative to Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.
12-
13- [ Filed with Secretary of State August 13, 2024. ]
1423
1524 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1625
1726 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1827
1928 SCR 158, Niello. Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.
2029
2130 This measure would declare September 2024 as Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.
2231
2332 This measure would declare September 2024 as Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.
2433
2534 ## Digest Key
2635
2736 ## Bill Text
2837
2938 WHEREAS, Chiari malformation is a serious neurological disorder affecting more than 300,000 people in the United States; and
3039
3140 WHEREAS, Chiari malformation was first identified by Austrian pathologist Professor Hans Chiari in the 1890s and categorized into four types, in order of severity; and
3241
3342 WHEREAS, Chiari malformation is a congenital malformation in which the bottom of the brain, known as the cerebellum, is crowded in the skull cavity and forces the lower tips of the cerebellar hemispheres, or tonsils, into the hole in the bottom of the skull, or foramen magnum; and
3443
3544 WHEREAS, Chiari malformations are defects in the cerebellum, the part of the brain that controls balance, and this creates pressure on the cerebellum and brain stem and may block the normal flow of cerebral spinal fluid to and from the brain; and
3645
3746 WHEREAS, Symptoms usually appear during adolescence or early adulthood and can include severe head and neck pain, vertigo, muscle weakness, balance problems, blurred or double vision, difficulty swallowing, and sleep apnea; and
3847
3948 WHEREAS, Individuals who have Chiari malformation may often have related conditions, such as hydrocephalus, spina bifida, syringomyelia, tethered spinal cord syndrome, and spinal curvature; and
4049
4150 WHEREAS, The National Institute of Neurological Disorders and Stroke within the National Institutes of Health, is conducting research to find alternative surgical options and to identify the cause of Chiari malformations to create improved treatment and prevention plans; now, therefore, be it
4251
4352 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares September 2024 as Chiari Malformation Awareness Month; and be it further
4453
4554 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.