09/10/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 207, Statutes of 2024. | |||
09/10/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
Senate | 08/31/2024 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 7120.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 29). | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2024 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2024 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5295.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2024 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2024 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 5057.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2024 | Set for hearing August 13. | ||
Senate | 08/07/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 08/05/2024 | (Corrected August 6.) | ||
Senate | 08/05/2024 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |