California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR20 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 2, 2023

Amended

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill April 10, 2023