08/23/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2023. | |||
08/23/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 08/15/2023 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2687.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 07/10/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 10). | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2023 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1683.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | From inactive file on motion of Senator Nguyen. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Nguyen. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 12/05/2022 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |