1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 33 CHAPTER 24 Relative to Hereditary and Genetic Cancer Awareness Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State April 18, 2023. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 33, Dodd. Hereditary and Genetic Cancer Awareness Day.This measure would declare May 3, 2023, and May 3 of each year thereafter, as Hereditary and Genetic Cancer Awareness Day, and encourage the residents of California to join together in raising awareness and heightening public knowledge of these hereditary and genetic mutations and resulting cancers.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Cancer affects 1 in 3 people in the United States; and WHEREAS, In 2022, there was an estimated 1,900,000 new cancer cases diagnosed and 609,360 cancer deaths in the United States, with 189,220 of those diagnoses occurring in California; and WHEREAS, An increasing number of cancer diagnoses have a hereditary or genetic connection; and WHEREAS, The terms hereditary and genetic are often used interchangeably when referring to inherited diseases, but while a genetic disease is also the result of a gene mutation, it may or may not be hereditary; andWHEREAS, Being diagnosed with a hereditary or genetic mutation is life changing and requires constant surveillance; and WHEREAS, There are many types of hereditary or genetic mutations, including mutations in the following genes: breast cancer (BRCA), tumor protein 53 (TP53), checkpoint kinase 2 (CHEK2), epithelial cellular adhesion molecule (EPCAM), and ataxia telangiesctasia, mutated (ATM); and WHEREAS, An example is Li-Fraumeni Syndrome, which is linked to a mutation in the TP53 gene and is a rare inherited syndrome that can lead to an increased risk of a number of cancers, including sarcoma, leukemia, brain cancers, cancer of the adrenal cortex, and breast cancer. These cancers often develop in relatively young adults or even children; andWHEREAS, People with any hereditary or genetic mutation often are diagnosed with rare cancers that are difficult to treat, and they can experience multiple cancers in their lifetime; and WHEREAS, It is important to increase awareness about the connection that genes have to cancer diagnoses, so Californians can be more informed and take action to determine their risk; and WHEREAS, More knowledge about hereditary and genetic mutations can lead to better outcomes for people diagnosed with related cancers; and WHEREAS, California has many of the worlds best medical and academic institutions that can help find better treatments and cures for cancers caused by hereditary and genetic mutations; and WHEREAS, Having a Hereditary and Genetic Cancer Awareness Day will help increase understanding of these mutations and ways to fight back against the resulting cancers; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares May 3, 2023, and May 3 of each year thereafter, as Hereditary and Genetic Cancer Awareness Day, and encourages the residents of California to join together in raising awareness and heightening public knowledge of these hereditary and genetic mutations and resulting cancers; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled April 11, 2023 Passed IN Senate March 16, 2023 Passed IN Assembly March 30, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 33Introduced by Senator Dodd(Principal coauthor: Senator Portantino)(Coauthor: Senator Rubio)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Arambula, Bains, Bennett, Berman, Boerner Horvath, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Cervantes, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gallagher, Gipson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, McCarty, McKinnor, Stephanie Nguyen, Pacheco, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)February 21, 2023 Relative to Hereditary and Genetic Cancer Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 33, Dodd. Hereditary and Genetic Cancer Awareness Day.This measure would declare May 3, 2023, and May 3 of each year thereafter, as Hereditary and Genetic Cancer Awareness Day, and encourage the residents of California to join together in raising awareness and heightening public knowledge of these hereditary and genetic mutations and resulting cancers.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Cancer affects 1 in 3 people in the United States; and WHEREAS, In 2022, there was an estimated 1,900,000 new cancer cases diagnosed and 609,360 cancer deaths in the United States, with 189,220 of those diagnoses occurring in California; and WHEREAS, An increasing number of cancer diagnoses have a hereditary or genetic connection; and WHEREAS, The terms hereditary and genetic are often used interchangeably when referring to inherited diseases, but while a genetic disease is also the result of a gene mutation, it may or may not be hereditary; andWHEREAS, Being diagnosed with a hereditary or genetic mutation is life changing and requires constant surveillance; and WHEREAS, There are many types of hereditary or genetic mutations, including mutations in the following genes: breast cancer (BRCA), tumor protein 53 (TP53), checkpoint kinase 2 (CHEK2), epithelial cellular adhesion molecule (EPCAM), and ataxia telangiesctasia, mutated (ATM); and WHEREAS, An example is Li-Fraumeni Syndrome, which is linked to a mutation in the TP53 gene and is a rare inherited syndrome that can lead to an increased risk of a number of cancers, including sarcoma, leukemia, brain cancers, cancer of the adrenal cortex, and breast cancer. These cancers often develop in relatively young adults or even children; andWHEREAS, People with any hereditary or genetic mutation often are diagnosed with rare cancers that are difficult to treat, and they can experience multiple cancers in their lifetime; and WHEREAS, It is important to increase awareness about the connection that genes have to cancer diagnoses, so Californians can be more informed and take action to determine their risk; and WHEREAS, More knowledge about hereditary and genetic mutations can lead to better outcomes for people diagnosed with related cancers; and WHEREAS, California has many of the worlds best medical and academic institutions that can help find better treatments and cures for cancers caused by hereditary and genetic mutations; and WHEREAS, Having a Hereditary and Genetic Cancer Awareness Day will help increase understanding of these mutations and ways to fight back against the resulting cancers; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares May 3, 2023, and May 3 of each year thereafter, as Hereditary and Genetic Cancer Awareness Day, and encourages the residents of California to join together in raising awareness and heightening public knowledge of these hereditary and genetic mutations and resulting cancers; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|