1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 42 CHAPTER 72Relative to Mothers Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 26, 2023. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 42, Ochoa Bogh. Mothers Day.This measure would recognize May 14, 2023, as the 116th annual Mothers Day and would urge all Californians to recognize, appreciate, and be grateful for the gifts and good works of mothers on that day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The first Mothers Day was held on the second Sunday in May 1907 in West Virginia; and WHEREAS, President Woodrow Wilson signed a congressional resolution in 1914 making Mothers Day an officially recognized day; and WHEREAS, The contributions of mothers past, present, and future deserve to be recognized, not just today, but every day; and WHEREAS, A mother is one who nurtures her family, her community, her country, and her world; and WHEREAS, Mothers Day is an opportunity to become better children and show our gratitude for those women who put the needs of others before their own needs; and WHEREAS, Each day, mothers provide counsel and serve as an example to their children and pass on the values that impact their legacy for generations; and WHEREAS, Each day, mothers enrich our lives by providing opportunities to grow physically, emotionally, intellectually, and spiritually; and WHEREAS, Women are more likely to serve as the primary caregiver for their children, spouse, parents, and others; and WHEREAS, One in four mothers are raising their children without a spouse or partner; and WHEREAS, In the United States, 23,500,000 women are working mothers; and WHEREAS, Mothers Day also recognizes those who are trying to become mothers, those who have lost their mothers, and the people in our lives who have taken on the motherhood role; andWHEREAS, Mothers play an important role in educating, caring for, and raising the next generation of artists, scientists, and community leaders; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes May 14, 2023, as the 116th annual Mothers Day and urges all Californians to recognize, appreciate, and be grateful for the gifts and good works of mothers on that day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 23, 2023 Passed IN Senate May 08, 2023 Passed IN Assembly May 18, 2023 Amended IN Senate May 02, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 42Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Coauthors: Senators Allen, Alvarado-Gil, Archuleta, Ashby, Atkins, Becker, Blakespear, Bradford, Caballero, Cortese, Dahle, Dodd, Durazo, Eggman, Glazer, Gonzalez, Grove, Hurtado, Jones, Laird, Limn, McGuire, Menjivar, Min, Newman, Nguyen, Niello, Padilla, Portantino, Roth, Rubio, Seyarto, Skinner, Smallwood-Cuevas, Stern, Umberg, Wahab, Wiener, and Wilk)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Wendy Carrillo, Cervantes, Davies, Dixon, Friedman, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Luz Rivas, Blanca Rubio, Schiavo, Soria, Waldron, Weber, Wilson, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Sanchez, Santiago, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Wallis, Ward, Wicks, Wood, and Zbur)March 16, 2023Relative to Mothers Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 42, Ochoa Bogh. Mothers Day.This measure would recognize May 14, 2023, as the 116th annual Mothers Day and would urge all Californians to recognize, appreciate, and be grateful for the gifts and good works of mothers on that day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The first Mothers Day was held on the second Sunday in May 1907 in West Virginia; and WHEREAS, President Woodrow Wilson signed a congressional resolution in 1914 making Mothers Day an officially recognized day; and WHEREAS, The contributions of mothers past, present, and future deserve to be recognized, not just today, but every day; and WHEREAS, A mother is one who nurtures her family, her community, her country, and her world; and WHEREAS, Mothers Day is an opportunity to become better children and show our gratitude for those women who put the needs of others before their own needs; and WHEREAS, Each day, mothers provide counsel and serve as an example to their children and pass on the values that impact their legacy for generations; and WHEREAS, Each day, mothers enrich our lives by providing opportunities to grow physically, emotionally, intellectually, and spiritually; and WHEREAS, Women are more likely to serve as the primary caregiver for their children, spouse, parents, and others; and WHEREAS, One in four mothers are raising their children without a spouse or partner; and WHEREAS, In the United States, 23,500,000 women are working mothers; and WHEREAS, Mothers Day also recognizes those who are trying to become mothers, those who have lost their mothers, and the people in our lives who have taken on the motherhood role; andWHEREAS, Mothers play an important role in educating, caring for, and raising the next generation of artists, scientists, and community leaders; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes May 14, 2023, as the 116th annual Mothers Day and urges all Californians to recognize, appreciate, and be grateful for the gifts and good works of mothers on that day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|