06/06/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2023. | |||
06/06/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2084.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 26). | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1073.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | From inactive file on motion of Senator Nguyen. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Nguyen. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 12/05/2022 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |