1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 53 CHAPTER 74 Relative to Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 26, 2023. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 53, Allen. Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month.This measure would encourage all Californians to support the arts and would recognize April 2023 as a significant time to recognize, appreciate, and celebrate the arts, culture, and creativity of all Californians.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The arts work to heal, build community, educate youth, advance racial justice, and create jobs; andWHEREAS, Arts are not only an important agent for economic development, but also impact societal issues that include health, corrections, housing, immigration, veterans, transportation, and education; andWHEREAS, It is imperative for all children and youth in California to have access to arts education in their schools; andWHEREAS, California employs the highest number of people in creative industries architecture, entertainment, fashion, media, and publishing than any other state in the nation; and WHEREAS, California is now the fourth largest economy in the world with a creative economy in 2021, according to the Otis Report on the Creative Economy of approximately $507.4 billion in direct economic impact and an estimated $978.6 billion in impact when combined direct, induced, and indirect factors are considered, representing a workforce of over 1,800,000 workers and 7.6% of the states GDP; andWHEREAS, the Legislature adopted SCR 33 on April 25, 2019, proclaiming April 2019, and every April thereafter, as Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month; andWHEREAS, In 2021, the Legislature, by adopting SCR 40, recognized artists as second responders who provide solace to our first responders who have suffered stress and trauma that are often not recognized or supported; andWHEREAS, Efforts must continue to increase funding for the arts, arts education, and cultural bearers; andWHEREAS, In a state as diverse as California, the arts serve to give a voice to our many communities, spark individual creativity, foster empathy and understanding, spur civic engagement, and serve as a continual source of personal enrichment, inspiration, and growth; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature encourages all Californians to deepen our support for arts in our schools and uplift and expand opportunities in our creative workforce; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature recognizes April 2023 as a significant time to recognize, appreciate, and celebrate the arts, culture, and creativity of all Californians; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 23, 2023 Passed IN Senate April 27, 2023 Passed IN Assembly May 18, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 53Introduced by Senator Allen(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wood, and Zbur)April 17, 2023 Relative to Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 53, Allen. Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month.This measure would encourage all Californians to support the arts and would recognize April 2023 as a significant time to recognize, appreciate, and celebrate the arts, culture, and creativity of all Californians.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The arts work to heal, build community, educate youth, advance racial justice, and create jobs; andWHEREAS, Arts are not only an important agent for economic development, but also impact societal issues that include health, corrections, housing, immigration, veterans, transportation, and education; andWHEREAS, It is imperative for all children and youth in California to have access to arts education in their schools; andWHEREAS, California employs the highest number of people in creative industries architecture, entertainment, fashion, media, and publishing than any other state in the nation; and WHEREAS, California is now the fourth largest economy in the world with a creative economy in 2021, according to the Otis Report on the Creative Economy of approximately $507.4 billion in direct economic impact and an estimated $978.6 billion in impact when combined direct, induced, and indirect factors are considered, representing a workforce of over 1,800,000 workers and 7.6% of the states GDP; andWHEREAS, the Legislature adopted SCR 33 on April 25, 2019, proclaiming April 2019, and every April thereafter, as Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month; andWHEREAS, In 2021, the Legislature, by adopting SCR 40, recognized artists as second responders who provide solace to our first responders who have suffered stress and trauma that are often not recognized or supported; andWHEREAS, Efforts must continue to increase funding for the arts, arts education, and cultural bearers; andWHEREAS, In a state as diverse as California, the arts serve to give a voice to our many communities, spark individual creativity, foster empathy and understanding, spur civic engagement, and serve as a continual source of personal enrichment, inspiration, and growth; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature encourages all Californians to deepen our support for arts in our schools and uplift and expand opportunities in our creative workforce; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature recognizes April 2023 as a significant time to recognize, appreciate, and celebrate the arts, culture, and creativity of all Californians; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|