08/23/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2023. | |||
08/23/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 08/15/2023 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2688.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1080.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |