06/20/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2023. | |||
06/20/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 2199.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 1). | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1102.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |