1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 67 CHAPTER 104 Relative to National Bike Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 20, 2023. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 67, Portantino. National Bike Month.This measure would designate the month of May 2023 as National Bike Month in California and would encourage Californians to ride bicycles for commuting and recreation, and California cities and counties to make streets safer for cycling.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, National Bike Month was established in 1956 by the League of American Bicyclists. Today, millions of Americans engage in bicycling as an affordable, environmentally sound mode of transportation, an excellent form of exercise, and as family recreation; andWHEREAS, The League of American Bicyclists has ranked the State of California as the fourth most bicycle-friendly state, based on the states 65 bicycle-friendly communities, 133 bicycle-friendly businesses, and 21 bicycle-friendly universities; andWHEREAS, National Bike Month is an opportunity to celebrate the unique power of the bicycle and the many reasons to ride, such as biking to work or school, running errands, riding to save money or time, preserving health or the environment, exploring local communities, or shopping at small businesses; andWHEREAS, The bicycle is an economic, healthy, convenient, and environmentally sound form of transportation and an excellent tool for recreation and the enjoyment of Californias scenic beauty; andWHEREAS, Creating a bicycle-friendly community has been credited with improving the health of local residents, growing local economies, attracting tourism dollars, and reducing pollution and road congestion; andWHEREAS, Creating a bicycling-friendly community has been shown to improve peoples health, well-being, and quality of life, improving traffic safety, supporting student learning outcomes, and reducing pollution, congestion, and wear and tear on our streets and roads; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates May 2023 as National Bike Month in California to celebrate the many benefits of bicycling, to encourage Californians to ride bicycles for commuting and recreation, and to urge local communities to create bicycle-friendly policies and facilities; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled June 15, 2023 Passed IN Senate May 18, 2023 Passed IN Assembly June 08, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 67Introduced by Senator Portantino(Coauthors: Senators Allen, Ashby, Atkins, Becker, Blakespear, Bradford, Caballero, Cortese, Dodd, Durazo, Eggman, Glazer, Gonzalez, Grove, Jones, Laird, Limn, McGuire, Menjivar, Newman, Padilla, Rubio, Skinner, Smallwood-Cuevas, Stern, Umberg, Wahab, and Wiener)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Friedman, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wood, and Zbur)May 08, 2023 Relative to National Bike Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 67, Portantino. National Bike Month.This measure would designate the month of May 2023 as National Bike Month in California and would encourage Californians to ride bicycles for commuting and recreation, and California cities and counties to make streets safer for cycling.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, National Bike Month was established in 1956 by the League of American Bicyclists. Today, millions of Americans engage in bicycling as an affordable, environmentally sound mode of transportation, an excellent form of exercise, and as family recreation; andWHEREAS, The League of American Bicyclists has ranked the State of California as the fourth most bicycle-friendly state, based on the states 65 bicycle-friendly communities, 133 bicycle-friendly businesses, and 21 bicycle-friendly universities; andWHEREAS, National Bike Month is an opportunity to celebrate the unique power of the bicycle and the many reasons to ride, such as biking to work or school, running errands, riding to save money or time, preserving health or the environment, exploring local communities, or shopping at small businesses; andWHEREAS, The bicycle is an economic, healthy, convenient, and environmentally sound form of transportation and an excellent tool for recreation and the enjoyment of Californias scenic beauty; andWHEREAS, Creating a bicycle-friendly community has been credited with improving the health of local residents, growing local economies, attracting tourism dollars, and reducing pollution and road congestion; andWHEREAS, Creating a bicycling-friendly community has been shown to improve peoples health, well-being, and quality of life, improving traffic safety, supporting student learning outcomes, and reducing pollution, congestion, and wear and tear on our streets and roads; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates May 2023 as National Bike Month in California to celebrate the many benefits of bicycling, to encourage Californians to ride bicycles for commuting and recreation, and to urge local communities to create bicycle-friendly policies and facilities; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|