07/11/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2023. | |||
07/11/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 07/06/2023 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/06/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2572.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2023 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1680.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |