1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 78 CHAPTER 139 Relative to June Dairy Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State August 23, 2023. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 78, Niello. June Dairy Month.This measure would proclaim the month of June to be June Dairy Month in California and would encourage all Californians to continue to support the American dairy industry by including dairy products as part of a healthy diet.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The national June Dairy Month, originally known as National Milk Month, has been an annual tradition since 1937, and is an opportunity for Americans to honor dairy farmers, acknowledge dairy farmers contributions to the economy, and recognize the importance of dairy products to a healthy diet for many Americans; andWHEREAS, California is Americas number one milk-producing state and the number two cheese-producing state; andWHEREAS, Dairy is the states number one agricultural commodity, generating $57,700,000,000 in economic activity; andWHEREAS, Ninety-nine percent of California dairy farms are family owned, and dairy farming in California has a 200-year heritage; andWHEREAS, One hundred eighty thousand jobs depend on Californias dairy industry, including 47,000 milk production and processing jobs; andWHEREAS, The landscape, economy, health, and nutrition of California would not be the same without our approximately 1,100 family farms; andWHEREAS, Dairy foods provide essential nutrients, including nearly 75 percent of the calcium naturally available in the food supply, as well as potassium, magnesium, and vitamin A, and milk is the number one source of calcium, potassium, phosphorus, and vitamin D in the American diet; andWHEREAS, Dairy foods also play a beneficial role in maintaining a healthy weight; andWHEREAS, Dairy foods, when consumed as part of a healthy diet, may help to reduce osteoporosis, hypertension, obesity, colon cancer, and metabolic syndrome, a cluster of conditions that can also lead to heart disease and type II diabetes; andWHEREAS, California dairy farm families are leading the world in planet-smart practices, including feeding agricultural byproducts and improving reproductive efficiency, nutrition, and animal comfort, resulting in a 45-percent reduction in greenhouse gas emissions over the last 50 years, an 88-percent reduction in water usage per gallon of milk produced, and an 89-percent reduction in land use, leading to less fossil fuel, pesticide, and energy use; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of June to be June Dairy Month in California, in honor of the work of dairy producers in California, and hereby encourages all Californians to continue to support the American dairy industry by including dairy products as part of a healthy diet; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled August 17, 2023 Passed IN Senate June 29, 2023 Passed IN Assembly August 14, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 78Introduced by Senator Niello(Coauthors: Senators Grove and Hurtado)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Connolly, Flora, Mathis, Robert Rivas, Villapudua, Addis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Lackey, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)June 14, 2023 Relative to June Dairy Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 78, Niello. June Dairy Month.This measure would proclaim the month of June to be June Dairy Month in California and would encourage all Californians to continue to support the American dairy industry by including dairy products as part of a healthy diet.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The national June Dairy Month, originally known as National Milk Month, has been an annual tradition since 1937, and is an opportunity for Americans to honor dairy farmers, acknowledge dairy farmers contributions to the economy, and recognize the importance of dairy products to a healthy diet for many Americans; andWHEREAS, California is Americas number one milk-producing state and the number two cheese-producing state; andWHEREAS, Dairy is the states number one agricultural commodity, generating $57,700,000,000 in economic activity; andWHEREAS, Ninety-nine percent of California dairy farms are family owned, and dairy farming in California has a 200-year heritage; andWHEREAS, One hundred eighty thousand jobs depend on Californias dairy industry, including 47,000 milk production and processing jobs; andWHEREAS, The landscape, economy, health, and nutrition of California would not be the same without our approximately 1,100 family farms; andWHEREAS, Dairy foods provide essential nutrients, including nearly 75 percent of the calcium naturally available in the food supply, as well as potassium, magnesium, and vitamin A, and milk is the number one source of calcium, potassium, phosphorus, and vitamin D in the American diet; andWHEREAS, Dairy foods also play a beneficial role in maintaining a healthy weight; andWHEREAS, Dairy foods, when consumed as part of a healthy diet, may help to reduce osteoporosis, hypertension, obesity, colon cancer, and metabolic syndrome, a cluster of conditions that can also lead to heart disease and type II diabetes; andWHEREAS, California dairy farm families are leading the world in planet-smart practices, including feeding agricultural byproducts and improving reproductive efficiency, nutrition, and animal comfort, resulting in a 45-percent reduction in greenhouse gas emissions over the last 50 years, an 88-percent reduction in water usage per gallon of milk produced, and an 89-percent reduction in land use, leading to less fossil fuel, pesticide, and energy use; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of June to be June Dairy Month in California, in honor of the work of dairy producers in California, and hereby encourages all Californians to continue to support the American dairy industry by including dairy products as part of a healthy diet; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|