09/05/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2023. | |||
09/05/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 08/28/2023 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2804.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 17). | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2023 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2097.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 07/12/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2023 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |