08/21/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2024. | |||
08/21/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 08/15/2024 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 57. Noes 11. Page 6312.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 1). | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2024 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 2. Page 4348.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3608.) (April 15). | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |