08/21/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2024. | |||
08/21/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 08/15/2024 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6322.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/13/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 13). | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2024 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 07/05/2024 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4930.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4786.) (June 26). | ||
Senate | 06/17/2024 | Set for hearing June 26. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |