06/20/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2023. | |||
06/20/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2221.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 7). | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 701.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 574.) (March 29). | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Set for hearing March 29. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |