California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR100 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/28/2024

                            Enrolled  June 28, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  June 27, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 100Introduced by Senator Caballero(Coauthors: Senators Ashby, Atkins, Blakespear, Rubio, and Smallwood-Cuevas)June 04, 2024 Relative to Native American Women Equal Pay Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 100, Caballero. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Sixty-one years after the passage of the federal Equal Pay Act of 1963 (Public Law 88-38), the pay disparity between Native American women and White men continues to make up the second largest wage gap in comparison to other ethnic groups; andWHEREAS, According to statistics released by the National Womens Law Center in 2024, Native American women on average make just $0.59 on the dollar for equivalent work compared to their White, male counterparts; andWHEREAS, This gap in pay typically amounts to a loss of $2,396 every month or $28,747 every year for Native American women; andWHEREAS, Unlike women from other groups, the wage gap actually increases with Native American womens education levels and exists across occupations; andWHEREAS, Native American women with a bachelors degree, masters degree, or doctorate degree stand to lose roughly $1,500,000 to the wage gap over a 40-year career; andWHEREAS, Native American women in urban areas make less than their rural and reservation community counterparts; andWHEREAS, This wage gap is tribewide and statewide as no Native American women community makes more than $0.69 for every dollar made by White, non-Hispanic men; andWHEREAS, A lifetime of lower pay means women have less income to save for retirement, and Native American women must work until 90 years of age to earn what a White, non-Hispanic man will earn by 60 years of age; andWHEREAS, Unequal pay means Native American women have less money to cover their expenses and leaves them economically insecure, which can have a ripple effect that results in Native American women missing key opportunities throughout their lifetimes to build wealth and future economic security for themselves, their families, and their communities; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Legislature proclaims November 30, 2024, as Native American Women Equal Pay Day in California in recognition of the need to eliminate the gender gap in earnings by Native American women and encourages employers and governments to take steps to ensure equitable compensation for Native American women in the workforce and to promote policies to ensure equal pay for all; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for distribution.

 Enrolled  June 28, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  June 27, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 100Introduced by Senator Caballero(Coauthors: Senators Ashby, Atkins, Blakespear, Rubio, and Smallwood-Cuevas)June 04, 2024 Relative to Native American Women Equal Pay Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 100, Caballero. Digest Key

 Enrolled  June 28, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  June 27, 2024

Enrolled  June 28, 2024
Passed IN  Senate  June 27, 2024

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 100

Introduced by Senator Caballero(Coauthors: Senators Ashby, Atkins, Blakespear, Rubio, and Smallwood-Cuevas)June 04, 2024

Introduced by Senator Caballero(Coauthors: Senators Ashby, Atkins, Blakespear, Rubio, and Smallwood-Cuevas)
June 04, 2024

 Relative to Native American Women Equal Pay Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 100, Caballero. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Sixty-one years after the passage of the federal Equal Pay Act of 1963 (Public Law 88-38), the pay disparity between Native American women and White men continues to make up the second largest wage gap in comparison to other ethnic groups; and

WHEREAS, According to statistics released by the National Womens Law Center in 2024, Native American women on average make just $0.59 on the dollar for equivalent work compared to their White, male counterparts; and

WHEREAS, This gap in pay typically amounts to a loss of $2,396 every month or $28,747 every year for Native American women; and

WHEREAS, Unlike women from other groups, the wage gap actually increases with Native American womens education levels and exists across occupations; and

WHEREAS, Native American women with a bachelors degree, masters degree, or doctorate degree stand to lose roughly $1,500,000 to the wage gap over a 40-year career; and

WHEREAS, Native American women in urban areas make less than their rural and reservation community counterparts; and

WHEREAS, This wage gap is tribewide and statewide as no Native American women community makes more than $0.69 for every dollar made by White, non-Hispanic men; and

WHEREAS, A lifetime of lower pay means women have less income to save for retirement, and Native American women must work until 90 years of age to earn what a White, non-Hispanic man will earn by 60 years of age; and

WHEREAS, Unequal pay means Native American women have less money to cover their expenses and leaves them economically insecure, which can have a ripple effect that results in Native American women missing key opportunities throughout their lifetimes to build wealth and future economic security for themselves, their families, and their communities; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Legislature proclaims November 30, 2024, as Native American Women Equal Pay Day in California in recognition of the need to eliminate the gender gap in earnings by Native American women and encourages employers and governments to take steps to ensure equitable compensation for Native American women in the workforce and to promote policies to ensure equal pay for all; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for distribution.