California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR123 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/16/2024

                            Enrolled  August 16, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  August 15, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 123Introduced by Senator Menjivar(Coauthor: Senator Gonzalez)August 12, 2024 Relative to Salvadoran American Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 123, Menjivar. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, On August 6, 1525, the official founding of Villa de San Salvador was declared in el Valle de Las Hamacas (the Valley of the Hammocks) where the indigenous ancestors of El Salvador fought historic battles against the submission and abuse of Spanish colonialism in order to preserve the life and liberty of the Cuscatleco population; andWHEREAS, On September 15, 1821, El Salvador achieved independence from Spain and ended centuries of Spanish colonialism; andWHEREAS, In the 20th century, 40 years of internal political turmoil forced hundreds of thousands of Salvadorans to flee El Salvador, seeking peace and security in a new country, the United States; andWHEREAS, Now Salvadoran Americans constitute one of the largest Latino communities nationwide, totaling 2.5 million, with 32 percent residing in California; andWHEREAS, The history of our nation and California is a rich and enduring tapestry woven with the threads of many remarkable lives, cultures, and events, and the lives, work, and artistry of Salvadoran Americans has added strength, vitality, and purpose to that tapestry; andWHEREAS, The maturing Salvadoran American community continues to make great economic and cultural contributions to daily life in California; andWHEREAS, Many of these admirable individuals actively participate in the state educational system, further promoting their sense of American pride within the California community; andWHEREAS, The strengths of the Salvadoran American culture can be preserved and passed on to future generations; andWHEREAS, Salvadoran American families, communities, and the generations that follow are committed to maintaining both Salvadoran and American cultures, while promoting cultural interchange; andWHEREAS, September 2024 marks 203 years of independence for the country of El Salvador; andWHEREAS, Free of prejudices and as proud men and women, Salvadoran Americans participate in and contribute to the integration of the social, educational, professional, and political arena in California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby declares September 1, 2024, as Salvadoran American Day and recognizes the rich heritage of Salvadoran Americans throughout California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  August 16, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  August 15, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 123Introduced by Senator Menjivar(Coauthor: Senator Gonzalez)August 12, 2024 Relative to Salvadoran American Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 123, Menjivar. Digest Key

 Enrolled  August 16, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  August 15, 2024

Enrolled  August 16, 2024
Passed IN  Senate  August 15, 2024

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 123

Introduced by Senator Menjivar(Coauthor: Senator Gonzalez)August 12, 2024

Introduced by Senator Menjivar(Coauthor: Senator Gonzalez)
August 12, 2024

 Relative to Salvadoran American Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 123, Menjivar. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, On August 6, 1525, the official founding of Villa de San Salvador was declared in el Valle de Las Hamacas (the Valley of the Hammocks) where the indigenous ancestors of El Salvador fought historic battles against the submission and abuse of Spanish colonialism in order to preserve the life and liberty of the Cuscatleco population; and

WHEREAS, On September 15, 1821, El Salvador achieved independence from Spain and ended centuries of Spanish colonialism; and

WHEREAS, In the 20th century, 40 years of internal political turmoil forced hundreds of thousands of Salvadorans to flee El Salvador, seeking peace and security in a new country, the United States; and

WHEREAS, Now Salvadoran Americans constitute one of the largest Latino communities nationwide, totaling 2.5 million, with 32 percent residing in California; and

WHEREAS, The history of our nation and California is a rich and enduring tapestry woven with the threads of many remarkable lives, cultures, and events, and the lives, work, and artistry of Salvadoran Americans has added strength, vitality, and purpose to that tapestry; and

WHEREAS, The maturing Salvadoran American community continues to make great economic and cultural contributions to daily life in California; and

WHEREAS, Many of these admirable individuals actively participate in the state educational system, further promoting their sense of American pride within the California community; and

WHEREAS, The strengths of the Salvadoran American culture can be preserved and passed on to future generations; and

WHEREAS, Salvadoran American families, communities, and the generations that follow are committed to maintaining both Salvadoran and American cultures, while promoting cultural interchange; and

WHEREAS, September 2024 marks 203 years of independence for the country of El Salvador; and

WHEREAS, Free of prejudices and as proud men and women, Salvadoran Americans participate in and contribute to the integration of the social, educational, professional, and political arena in California; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby declares September 1, 2024, as Salvadoran American Day and recognizes the rich heritage of Salvadoran Americans throughout California; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.