LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR34
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR34
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR34
Action History
Senate
07/03/2023
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 1866.)
Senate
06/08/2023
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Senate
06/07/2023
From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1480.) (June 7).
Senate
05/12/2023
Set for hearing June 7.
Senate
05/10/2023
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
Senate
05/02/2023
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.