California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR46 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Enrolled September 11, 2023 Passed IN Senate September 07, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 46Introduced by Senator LimnJuly 12, 2023 Relative to the anniversary of the Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 46, Limn. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution (Nineteenth Amendment), which legally guaranteed American women the right to vote, was ratified on August 18, 1920; andWHEREAS, Initially introduced to Congress in 1878, suffragists picketed, lobbied states, and challenged male-only voting laws in courts until Congress passed the amendment on June 4, 1919; andWHEREAS, Although the amendment signified the protection against the discrimination of women, women of color were continually excluded for another 45 years until the passage of the Voting Rights Act of 1965; andWHEREAS, Additionally, women with disabilities were only able to secure protections in 1990 after the passage of the Americans with Disabilities Act. Nearly one decade prior, California became the sixth state in the nation to approve political equality; andWHEREAS, The Legislature placed Proposition 4 on the ballot, and voters approved the measure on October 10, 1911; andWHEREAS, Since then, women voters have improved the state by exercising their position at the ballot box, lobbying their representatives, and forming civic leagues statewide; andWHEREAS, The Nineteenth Amendment played a pivotal role in promoting reproductive rights for women. As a result, women experienced economic progress with the increased availability of family planning services and supplies, allowing more women to enroll in higher education and enter professional occupations; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes the 103 years since the passage of the Nineteenth Amendment and urges all Californians to join in celebrating the anniversary of the Nineteenth Amendment; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 46Introduced by Senator LimnJuly 12, 2023 Relative to the anniversary of the Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 46, as introduced, Limn. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution (Nineteenth Amendment), which legally guaranteed American women the right to vote, was ratified on August 18, 1920; andWHEREAS, Initially introduced to Congress in 1878, suffragists picketed, lobbied states, and challenged male-only voting laws in courts until Congress passed the amendment on June 4, 1919; andWHEREAS, Although the amendment signified the protection against the discrimination of women, women of color were continually excluded for another 45 years until the passage of the Voting Rights Act of 1965; andWHEREAS, Additionally, women with disabilities were only able to secure protections in 1990 after the passage of the Americans with Disabilities Act. Nearly one decade prior, California became the sixth state in the nation to approve political equality; andWHEREAS, The Legislature placed Proposition 4 on the ballot, and voters approved the measure on October 10, 1911; andWHEREAS, Since then, women voters have improved the state by exercising their position at the ballot box, lobbying their representatives, and forming civic leagues statewide; andWHEREAS, The Nineteenth Amendment played a pivotal role in promoting reproductive rights for women. As a result, women experienced economic progress with the increased availability of family planning services and supplies, allowing more women to enroll in higher education and enter professional occupations; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes the 103 years since the passage of the Nineteenth Amendment and urges all Californians to join in celebrating the anniversary of the Nineteenth Amendment; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Enrolled September 11, 2023 Passed IN Senate September 07, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 46Introduced by Senator LimnJuly 12, 2023 Relative to the anniversary of the Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 46, Limn. Digest Key
3+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 46Introduced by Senator LimnJuly 12, 2023 Relative to the anniversary of the Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 46, as introduced, Limn. Digest Key
44
5- Enrolled September 11, 2023 Passed IN Senate September 07, 2023
65
7-Enrolled September 11, 2023
8-Passed IN Senate September 07, 2023
6+
7+
98
109 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION
1110
1211 Senate Resolution
1312
1413 No. 46
1514
1615 Introduced by Senator LimnJuly 12, 2023
1716
1817 Introduced by Senator Limn
1918 July 12, 2023
2019
2120 Relative to the anniversary of the Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution.
2221
2322 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
2423
2524 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
2625
27-SR 46, Limn.
26+SR 46, as introduced, Limn.
2827
2928
3029
3130 ## Digest Key
3231
3332 ## Bill Text
3433
3534 WHEREAS, The Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution (Nineteenth Amendment), which legally guaranteed American women the right to vote, was ratified on August 18, 1920; and
3635
3736 WHEREAS, Initially introduced to Congress in 1878, suffragists picketed, lobbied states, and challenged male-only voting laws in courts until Congress passed the amendment on June 4, 1919; and
3837
3938 WHEREAS, Although the amendment signified the protection against the discrimination of women, women of color were continually excluded for another 45 years until the passage of the Voting Rights Act of 1965; and
4039
4140 WHEREAS, Additionally, women with disabilities were only able to secure protections in 1990 after the passage of the Americans with Disabilities Act. Nearly one decade prior, California became the sixth state in the nation to approve political equality; and
4241
4342 WHEREAS, The Legislature placed Proposition 4 on the ballot, and voters approved the measure on October 10, 1911; and
4443
4544 WHEREAS, Since then, women voters have improved the state by exercising their position at the ballot box, lobbying their representatives, and forming civic leagues statewide; and
4645
4746 WHEREAS, The Nineteenth Amendment played a pivotal role in promoting reproductive rights for women. As a result, women experienced economic progress with the increased availability of family planning services and supplies, allowing more women to enroll in higher education and enter professional occupations; now, therefore, be it
4847
4948 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes the 103 years since the passage of the Nineteenth Amendment and urges all Californians to join in celebrating the anniversary of the Nineteenth Amendment; and be it further
5049
5150 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.