California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR47 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/30/2023

                            Enrolled  August 30, 2023 Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 47Introduced by Senator BradfordAugust 14, 2023 Relative to Black Brewers Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 47, Bradford. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The rich tapestry of our nation is woven with the vibrant threads of diversity, and the State of California stands as a shining example of this beautiful mosaic; andWHEREAS, Throughout history, African Americans have made significant contributions to the culture, economy, and social fabric of our state, and have played an integral role in shaping the brewing industry in California; andWHEREAS, The craft beer industry has experienced remarkable growth and innovation, and African American brewers have emerged as talented artisans, creating unique and exceptional brews that showcase their passion, creativity, and dedication; andWHEREAS, On October 10, 1970, Theodore A. (Ted) Mack, Sr. and business associates celebrated the purchase of Peoples Brewing Company in Oshkosh, Wisconsin, with over 2,000 guests, including stockholders, local and state legislators, and notable dignitaries; andWHEREAS, Mr. Mack became the first Black brewery president in the United States, and Peoples Brewing Company became the first Black-owned brewery in the history of the United States; andWHEREAS, The National Black Brewers Association was formed in Sacramento, California, in 2023; andWHEREAS, It is essential to recognize and celebrate the achievements and contributions of Black brewers in California, who have overcome challenges and barriers to establish themselves as pillars of the craft beer community, inspiring others, and breaking down barriers of racial inequality; andWHEREAS, The establishment of National Black Brewers Day provides an opportunity for Californians to acknowledge, honor, and support the accomplishments of Black brewers, to raise awareness about the diversity within the brewing industry, and to foster a spirit of inclusion and equality; andWHEREAS, Celebrating National Black Brewers Day will encourage individuals and communities to discover and appreciate the exceptional craftsmanship and unique flavors that Black brewers bring to the brewing industry; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby proclaims October 10, 2023, as Black Brewers Day and encourages Californians to observe this day with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities to celebrate and acknowledge the contributions of Black brewers in California and the United States; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  August 30, 2023 Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 47Introduced by Senator BradfordAugust 14, 2023 Relative to Black Brewers Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 47, Bradford. Digest Key

 Enrolled  August 30, 2023 Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2023

Enrolled  August 30, 2023
Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2023

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 47

Introduced by Senator BradfordAugust 14, 2023

Introduced by Senator Bradford
August 14, 2023

 Relative to Black Brewers Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 47, Bradford. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The rich tapestry of our nation is woven with the vibrant threads of diversity, and the State of California stands as a shining example of this beautiful mosaic; and

WHEREAS, Throughout history, African Americans have made significant contributions to the culture, economy, and social fabric of our state, and have played an integral role in shaping the brewing industry in California; and

WHEREAS, The craft beer industry has experienced remarkable growth and innovation, and African American brewers have emerged as talented artisans, creating unique and exceptional brews that showcase their passion, creativity, and dedication; and

WHEREAS, On October 10, 1970, Theodore A. (Ted) Mack, Sr. and business associates celebrated the purchase of Peoples Brewing Company in Oshkosh, Wisconsin, with over 2,000 guests, including stockholders, local and state legislators, and notable dignitaries; and

WHEREAS, Mr. Mack became the first Black brewery president in the United States, and Peoples Brewing Company became the first Black-owned brewery in the history of the United States; and

WHEREAS, The National Black Brewers Association was formed in Sacramento, California, in 2023; and

WHEREAS, It is essential to recognize and celebrate the achievements and contributions of Black brewers in California, who have overcome challenges and barriers to establish themselves as pillars of the craft beer community, inspiring others, and breaking down barriers of racial inequality; and

WHEREAS, The establishment of National Black Brewers Day provides an opportunity for Californians to acknowledge, honor, and support the accomplishments of Black brewers, to raise awareness about the diversity within the brewing industry, and to foster a spirit of inclusion and equality; and

WHEREAS, Celebrating National Black Brewers Day will encourage individuals and communities to discover and appreciate the exceptional craftsmanship and unique flavors that Black brewers bring to the brewing industry; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby proclaims October 10, 2023, as Black Brewers Day and encourages Californians to observe this day with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities to celebrate and acknowledge the contributions of Black brewers in California and the United States; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.