LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR60
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR60
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR60
Action History
Senate
03/07/2024
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3254.)
Senate
03/06/2024
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Senate
03/05/2024
Ordered to second reading.
Senate
03/05/2024
Read third time and amended.
Senate
02/14/2024
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
Senate
01/25/2024
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.