Senate | 04/07/2025 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2025 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.) | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2025 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2025 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 26). | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2025 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2025 | Referred to Com. on Elections. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2025 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2025 | Read first time. To print. |