LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB684
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB684
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2025-2026 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB684
Action History
Assembly
04/24/2025
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Assembly
04/09/2025
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Assembly
03/10/2025
Referred to Coms. on Higher ED. and G.O.
Assembly
02/15/2025
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
Assembly
02/14/2025
Read first time. To print.