Assembly | 04/29/2025 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2025 | Re-referred to Com. on E.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2025 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2025 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2025 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2025 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2025 | Read first time. To print. |