Senate | 04/23/2025 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Set for hearing April 30 in E.Q. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | April 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |