Senate | 04/24/2025 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2025 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 12. | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |