Senate | 05/02/2025 | Set for hearing May 12. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2025 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25). | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Set for hearing March 25. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and M. & V.A. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2025 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |