Senate | 04/25/2025 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | April 28 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | April 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Set for hearing April 21. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |