Senate | 05/02/2025 | Set for hearing May 12. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2025 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |