Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Set for hearing April 29 in JUD. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Re-referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |