Senate | 04/25/2025 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |