Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1010 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 1, 2022
Fiscal Note February 10, 2022
Fiscal Note January 21, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2022
Bill April 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2022

Amended

Bill May 6, 2022
Bill May 4, 2022