05/02/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
04/29/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |