Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1068 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 12, 2022
Fiscal Note February 22, 2022
Fiscal Note January 31, 2022
Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 17, 2022
Bill March 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2022

Amended

Bill April 20, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022