Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1083 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 13, 2022
Fiscal Note April 21, 2022
Fiscal Note February 4, 2022
Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2022
Bill April 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2022

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill April 28, 2022