04/12/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
04/08/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |