Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1097 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 25, 2022
Fiscal Note February 2, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 14, 2022
Bill February 11, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2022

Amended

Bill March 7, 2022
Bill March 5, 2022